RI H5041 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits development of land contiguous to State House unless approved by general assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Public Property And Works

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2019-03-05HouseHouse read and passed
2019-03-01HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/05/2019)
2019-02-27HouseCommittee recommends passage
2019-02-15HouseScheduled for consideration (02/27/2019)
2019-01-23HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-01-18HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/23/2019)
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback