RI H5091 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Ten Trees Group, Inc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Ten Trees Group, Inc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2019-04-09HouseTransmitted to Governor
2019-04-09SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/09/2019)
2019-02-27HouseHouse read and passed
2019-02-15HousePlaced on House Calendar (02/27/2019)
2019-02-05HouseCommittee recommends passage
2019-02-01HouseScheduled for consideration (02/05/2019)
2019-01-29HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-01-25HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/29/2019)
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback