RI H5113 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-28 - Defeated by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-28 - Defeated by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "animal abuser registry act" which would require all persons convicted of crimes involving animal abuse to register with an online registry to be established and maintained by the attorney general's office.
Title
Animal Abuser Registry Act
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 8 N: 22 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 55 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 55 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Defeated by Senate |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2019-05-23 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-05-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/23/2019) |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/14/2019) |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/05/2019) |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |