RI H5116 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires retail establishments to accept cash in payment for goods and services.
Title
General Regulatory Provisions - Deceptive Trade Practices
Sponsors
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2019) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2019-05-14 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-05-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/14/2019) |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-05-03 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/07/2019) |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/05/2019) |
2019-01-25 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (01/29/2019) |
2019-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |