RI H5120 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires insurance coverage for non-opioid treatment alternatives.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. Christopher Millea [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019) |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (01/30/2019) |
2019-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5120.pdf |