RI H5125 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Serves to codify the privacy rights guaranteed by the decision reached in the United States Supreme Court case of Roe v. Wade, 410 U.S. 113 (1973) and its progeny.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Reproductive Privacy Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Senate - The reproductive privacy act approval of amendment (Y: 12 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-19 - Senate - The reproductive privacy act recommit to committee (Y: 10 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-19 - House - Passage in concurrence passage of amendment (Y: 24 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-19 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 45 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Passage approval of amendment (Y: 14 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-19 - Senate - The reproductive privacy act approval of amendment (Y: 13 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-19 - Senate - The reproductive privacy act transmittal (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - The reproductive privacy act approval of amendment (Y: 11 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-19 - Senate - The reproductive privacy act approval of amendment (Y: 13 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - Passage (Y: 44 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 29 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 33 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 29 N: 42 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 26 N: 44 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 13 N: 57 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateSigned by Governor
2019-06-19SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-19HouseHouse passed Sub B in concurrence
2019-06-19HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/19/2019)
2019-06-19SenateSenate passed Sub B
2019-06-13SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/19/2019)
2019-06-13SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub B
2019-06-11SenateProposed Substitute
2019-06-11SenateScheduled for consideration (06/13/2019)
2019-06-11SenateCommittee transferred to Senate Health and Human Services
2019-06-10SenateProposed Substitute
2019-06-07SenateScheduled for consideration (06/11/2019)
2019-05-14SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-05-10SenateScheduled for consideration (05/14/2019)
2019-03-19SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2019-03-07HouseHouse passed Sub A
2019-03-05HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/07/2019)
2019-03-05HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-03-01HouseProposed Substitute
2019-03-01HouseScheduled for consideration (03/05/2019)
2019-01-29HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-01-25HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/29/2019)
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://status.rilin.state.ri.us/
Texthttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText19/HouseText19/H5125.pdf
Texthttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText19/HouseText19/H5125A.pdf
Texthttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText19/HouseText19/H5125B.pdf
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=16209
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=16208
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=16207
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=16206
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=16205
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=16210
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=12252
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=12251
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=12253
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=12254
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=12250
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=12248
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=16475
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/HVotes/votereport.asp?id=16474
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=12247
Roll Callhttp://webserver.rilin.state.ri.us/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=12249

Bill Comments

feedback