RI H5147 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-22 - Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-22 - Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a special license plate for MASONIC GRAND LODGE CHARITIES OF RHODE ISLAND, specify the minimum order and govern the amount and distribution of the fee surcharge.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles -- Special Plate For Masonic Grand Lodge Charities Of Rhode Island
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] | Rep. Bernard Hawkins [D] |
Rep. Jose Serodio [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2019-04-23 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-04-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/23/2019) |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-04-03 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-03-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/04/2019) |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2019) |
2019-02-15 | House | Committee transferred to House Special Legislation |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |