RI H5160 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Serves as the enabling act required by Rhode Island General Laws ยง 16-7-44 in order for the interest on bonds issued in support of school housing projects to be eligible for state housing aid reimbursement.
Title
In Accordance With Rhode Island General Law Section 16-7-44 Approving The Issuance Of $160,000,000 General Obligation Bonds, Notes And Other Evidences Of Indebtedness Of The City Of Providence To Fund The School Capital Improvements Plan For The Fiscal Years 2019-2024
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
Rep. Moira Walsh [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Finance |
2019-05-09 | House | House read and passed |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/09/2019) |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/07/2019) |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2019) |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |