RI H5163 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Permits applicants for commercial driver's licenses to carry over parts of the required examinations that they passed for a period of two years and require them to retake those portions not passed.
Title
Rhode Island Uniform Commercial Driver's License Act
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] |
Rep. Bernard Hawkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2019) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2019-05-08 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/08/2019) |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-04-29 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-04-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/01/2019) |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/13/2019) |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/06/2019) |
2019-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |