RI H5170 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires active duty military personnel receive daycare services for their dependents at state expense.
Title
Benefits For Active Duty
Sponsors
Rep. James McLaughlin [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2017) |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5170.pdf |