RI H5178 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Rhode Island Program to address Alzheimer's disease.
Title
Establishing A Program Within The Department Of Health To Address Alzheimer's Disease
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. James Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-26 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-21 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2019) |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |