RI H5184 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires pharmacies display warning notice regarding use of opioids/schedule II controlled substances compiled by DOH relating to overuse/misuse/mixing with other drugs/alcohol effective 9/1/19.
Title
Pharmacies
Sponsors
Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Pharmacies approval of amendment (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Pharmacies approval of amendment (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-26 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2019) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2019-04-24 | House | House read and passed |
2019-04-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/24/2019) |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/09/2019) |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/05/2019) |
2019-01-28 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (01/29/2019) |
2019-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |