RI H5187 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ratifies and validates the amendments to the Barrington Home Rule Charter which were approved by the electors of the town of Barrington at the polls on November 6, 2018.
Title
Validating And Ratifying Amendments To The Home Rule Charter
Sponsors
Rep. Liana Cassar [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Moira Walsh [D] | Rep. Jason Knight [D] |
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-04-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/03/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2019-03-06 | House | House read and passed |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/06/2019) |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-02-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/28/2019) |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/31/2019) |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |