RI H5188 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the amount of reimbursement funds required to be paid by the Rhode Island airport corporation to the city of Warwick for municipal services.
Title
Airports And Landing Fields
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Rep. David Bennett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2019) |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5188.pdf |