RI H5192 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes and requires funding for a world language and dual language immersion program.
Title
The World Language And Dual Language Immersion Act
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019) |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5192.pdf |