RI H5204 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that enrollees in the Rhode Island best RX Prescription drug discount program for the uninsured are not charged a copay for their prescriptions.
Title
Rhode Island Best Rx Prescription Drug Discount Program For The Uninsured
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2019) |
2019-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5204.pdf |