RI H5207 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the travel insurance act to establish comprehensive/uniform regulatory framework for travel insurance. Clarifying/bolstering enforcement authority over participants in the travel insurance industry.
Title
Travel Insurance Act
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] |
Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2019-05-28 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/28/2019) |
2019-05-21 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-05-16 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/21/2019) |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/05/2019) |
2019-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |