RI H5223 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pension benefits that originate from and were taxed in another state are exempted from Rhode Island state taxation.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2019) |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5223.pdf |