RI H5224 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from the sale or use tax that portion of a motor vehicle lease payment collected for tangible personal property tax, municipal property tax, excise, or any other similar tax.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes - Liability And Computation
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2019) |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5224.pdf |