RI H5227 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates And Amending The Membership Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Effect Of Wind Turbines On All Marine Life (amends The Membership Of The Commission To Study The Effect Of Wind Turbines On All Marine Life, From 5 To 7 Members, And Extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates From February 7, 2019, To April 30, 2019, And Expires On May 30, 2019.)
Title
House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates And Amending The Membership Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Effect Of Wind Turbines On All Marine Life (amends The Membership Of The Commission To Study The Effect Of Wind Turbines On All Marine Life, From 5 To 7 Members, And Extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates From February 7, 2019, To April 30, 2019, And Expires On May 30, 2019.)
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Price [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2019) |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5227.pdf |