RI H5236 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the office of inspector general as an independent administrative agency charged with the responsibility to investigate, detect, and prevent fraud, waste, abuse, and mismanagement in the expenditure of public funds.
Title
Establishing An Office Of Inspector General
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] |
Rep. Liana Cassar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2019) |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5236.pdf |