RI H5278 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Extends the requirement to collect sales tax to remote sellers in a way that conforms to a recent U.S. Supreme Court decision making it easier for states to compel collection/sales tax from retailers who do not have a physical presence in their state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales And Use Tax--non-collecting Retailers, Referrers, And Retail Sale Facilitators Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by Governor
2019-03-28HouseTransmitted to Governor
2019-03-28SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (03/28/2019)
2019-03-13HouseHouse passed Sub A
2019-03-08HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/13/2019)
2019-03-05HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-03-01HouseProposed Substitute
2019-03-01HouseScheduled for consideration (03/05/2019)
2019-02-07HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-02-05HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2019)
2019-02-05HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback