RI H5289 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Ensures appropriate disability language is used in all job descriptions and statutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriate Disability Language

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-26 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseSigned by Governor
2019-06-26HouseTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-26SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2019-06-25SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/26/2019)
2019-06-19SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2019-06-14SenateScheduled for consideration (06/19/2019)
2019-06-13SenateReferred to Senate Labor
2019-06-13HouseHouse read and passed
2019-06-07HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/13/2019)
2019-06-05HouseCommittee recommends passage
2019-05-31HouseScheduled for consideration (06/05/2019)
2019-03-06HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-01HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2019)
2019-02-15HouseCommittee transferred to House H.E.W.
2019-02-06HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback