RI H5305 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the effective date of the Rhode Island Uninsured Protection Fund from February 1, 2019 to September 1, 2019.
Title
Rhode Island Uninsured Protection Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-03-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/27/2019) |
2019-03-19 | House | House read and passed |
2019-03-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/19/2019) |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-03-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/13/2019) |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/13/2019) |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |