RI H5327 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires every electric and natural gas distribution company to submit an emergency response plan for review and approval by the division of public utilities.
Title
Duties Of Utilities And Carriers
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2019) |
2019-02-12 | House | Meeting postponed (02/12/2019) |
2019-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5327.pdf |