RI H5333 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that prisoners who committed offenses prior to age eighteen (18) and were sentenced as adults would be eligible for parole after completing fifteen (15) years of their sentence.
Title
Correctional Institutions - Parole
Sponsors
Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Rep. Arthur Handy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2019) |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5333.pdf |