RI H5343 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates sexual harassment training for employees and supervisors of employers of fifty (50) or more employees. It would recommend an annual climate survey for employers.
Title
Sexual Harassment, Education And Training In The Workplace
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Moira Walsh [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2019) |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5343.pdf |