RI H5381 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the period for musical and theatrical productions to obtain tax credits to July 1, 2024.
Title
Musical And Theatrical Production Tax Credits
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] |
Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Finance |
2019-05-07 | House | House read and passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/07/2019) |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-04-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/01/2019) |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2019) |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |