RI H5385 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $185,000 To The Division Of Elderly Affairs In The Department Of Human Services To Fund Elder Respite Services (authorizes The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $185,000 To The Division Of Elderly Affairs In The Department Of Human Services.)
Title
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $185,000 To The Division Of Elderly Affairs In The Department Of Human Services To Fund Elder Respite Services (authorizes The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $185,000 To The Division Of Elderly Affairs In The Department Of Human Services.)
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2019) |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5385.pdf |