RI H5419 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides conditions to lawfully permit a state employee to be employed as an interpreter or a CART provider outside of the normal working hours.
Title
Commission On The Deaf And Hard-of-hearing
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2019-06-04 | House | House read and passed |
2019-05-31 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/04/2019) |
2019-05-22 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/22/2019) |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2019) |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |