RI H5428 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that any person who is convicted of, or pleads nolo contendere to a charge of cruelty to animals shall be required to reimburse any adoptive owner for reasonable costs associated with treating the animals' injuries.
Title
Cruelty To Animals
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2019) |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5428.pdf |