RI H5429 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Extends the benefits of the dual enrollment equal opportunity act to cover home-schooled students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dual Enrollment Equal Opportunity Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Senate Education
2019-05-16HouseHouse read and passed
2019-05-10HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/16/2019)
2019-05-01HouseCommittee recommends passage
2019-04-29HouseScheduled for consideration (05/01/2019)
2019-03-13HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-08HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2019)
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback