RI H5466 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that all electrical work performed in the state be done in accordance with the latest edition of the National Electrical Code, and would also require that the state building commission adopt the latest edition of the National Electrical Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Building Code - Administration And Enforcement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2019-05-31SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2019)
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Senate Labor
2019-04-03HouseHouse passed Sub A
2019-03-29HousePlaced on House Calendar (04/03/2019)
2019-03-26HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-03-22HouseProposed Substitute
2019-03-22HouseScheduled for consideration (03/26/2019)
2019-03-05HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-01HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2019)
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback