RI H5489 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows plaintiffs seeking a domestic abuse protective order in family court to include any of their minor children who are not related to the defendant by blood or marriage within the same complaint and restraining order.
Title
Domestic Abuse Prevention
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
Rep. Alex Marszalkowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2019-06-13 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-06-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-04 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-05-31 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2019) |
2019-05-31 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-28 | House | Meeting postponed (05/28/2019) |
2019-05-24 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2019) |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |