RI H5520 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-22 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-22 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires any mayoral academy which is part of a network that seeks to be established or expanded to provide evidence that its attrition rates, special education rates and suspension rates are within acceptable averages.
Title
Mayoral Academies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - Passage (Y: 59 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2019-04-10 | House | House read and passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/10/2019) |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-03-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/03/2019) |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2019) |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |