RI H5538 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Committee recommends passage in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

School boards to establish threat assessment policies and teams. Oversight committee for the teams is established.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health And Safety Of Pupils

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2019-06-07SenateScheduled for consideration (06/12/2019)
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Senate Education
2019-04-24HouseHouse read and passed
2019-04-15HousePlaced on House Calendar (04/24/2019)
2019-04-10HouseCommittee recommends passage
2019-04-05HouseScheduled for consideration (04/10/2019)
2019-04-03HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-29HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2019)
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback