RI H5539 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Rhode Island Department Of Health To Develop Statewide Sepsis Protocols
Title
House Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Rhode Island Department Of Health To Develop Statewide Sepsis Protocols
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | House read and passed |
2019-04-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/23/2019) |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/10/2019) |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |