RI H5540 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the state department of health to post and maintain on its website a link to ClinicalTrials.gov, a free service of the National Institutes of Health Library of Medicine.
Title
Department Of Health - Clinical Trials Website
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] |
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee heard |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing (06/11/2019) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2019-05-21 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/21/2019) |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-04-26 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-04-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/01/2019) |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |