RI H5541 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the provisions requiring the reporting of immunization status and any other relevant information to adults, not just children, and requires the department of health to include routine adult immunization in the department’s immunization program.
Title
Department Of Health
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. James Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 61 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 61 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-19 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-12 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-11 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2019) |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |