RI H5543 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adds the multi-disciplinary maternal mortality review committee to the review of the office of state medical examiners and extend certain immunities and confidentiality agreements to multi-disciplinary teams.
Title
Office Of State Medical Examiners
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | House passed Sub B in concurrence |
2019-06-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2019) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2019-05-28 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/28/2019) |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-05-10 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2019) |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |