RI H5550 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a formula for the assessment of municipal construction permit fees.
Title
State Building Code
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. Joseph Trillo [R] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/24/2015) |
2015-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A |
2015-06-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2015) |
2015-06-22 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2015) |
2015-06-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-06-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2015) |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |