RI H5550 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires various health care facilities and child care facilities to have automated external defibrillators on site.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Health And Safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-22HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2019)
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback