RI H5553 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-11 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-11 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations For Encouraging More Persons Of Color To Enter The Field Of Education (creates A 13 Member Commission To Study And Make Recommendations For Encouraging More Persons Of Color To Enter The Field Of Education, And Who Would Report Back By April 17, 2020, And Expire On June 17, 2020.)
Title
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations For Encouraging More Persons Of Color To Enter The Field Of Education (creates A 13 Member Commission To Study And Make Recommendations For Encouraging More Persons Of Color To Enter The Field Of Education, And Who Would Report Back By April 17, 2020, And Expire On June 17, 2020.)
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-06-07 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/11/2019) |
2019-05-29 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-05-24 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/29/2019) |
2019-05-21 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/22/2019) |
2019-05-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2019) |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/27/2019) |
2019-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |