RI H5558 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a licensed pharmacist, who successfully completes a course on tobacco cessation therapy, to prescribe and dispense tobacco cessation drug products to a qualified patient pursuant to rules adopted by the board of pharmacy.
Title
Pharmacies
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
Rep. Bernard Hawkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5558.pdf |