RI H5567 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the current law so that digital breast tomosynthesis (dbt) screenings are available wherever mammograms are conducted and to provide insurance coverage for such screenings.
Title
The Breast Cancer Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5567.pdf |