RI H5597 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides, for the tax year 2018 and thereafter, that any tax overpayment would be refunded with interest calculated at twelve percent (12%) compounded daily if not received by the thirtieth day of June in the subsequent year.
Title
Personal Income Tax -- Part 44-30-81 Procedure And Administration
Sponsors
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. David Place [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] |
Rep. George Nardone [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5597.pdf |