RI H5601 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Freezes the amount of education aid for local school agencies that are scheduled to receive less aid under the funding formula. The education aid would be frozen at the rate provided in fiscal year 2019 for a period of three (3) years.
Title
The Education Equity And Property Tax Relief Act -- School Funding Formula
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] |
Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5601.pdf |