RI H5603 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides certain restrictions on the sale of tobacco products, enhance the definition of "tobacco products", and would raise the minimum age to purchase tobacco products and nicotine delivery systems from 18 to 21 years of age
Title
Tobacco And Nicotine Products--children
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Christopher Millea [D] |
Rep. Liana Cassar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5603.pdf |