RI H5604 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/14/2019)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/14/2019)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the income eligibility limit for medical assistance coverage for seniors and disabled individuals from one hundred percent (100%) to one hundred thirty-three percent (133%) of federal poverty level.
Title
Health Care For Elderly And Disabled
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
Rep. Susan Donovan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/14/2019) |
2019-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5604.pdf |