RI H5606 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates requirement that political subdivisions provide list of employees as of July 1 of preceding year to take administrator by August 1 of each year.
Title
Compliance Of Public Employees With State Income Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] |
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/09/2019) |
2019-04-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5606.pdf |